Global Patent Index - EP 1040616 A4

EP 1040616 A4 2000-12-27 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF AUTHENTICATING A KEY AND TRANSMITTING SECURE DATA

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD OF AUTHENTICATING A KEY AND TRANSMITTING SECURE DATA

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG EINES SCHÜSSELS UND ÜBERTRAGUNG GESICHERTER DATEN.

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'AUTHENTIFICATION DE CLE ET DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES PROTEGEES

Publication

EP 1040616 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99970527 A

Priority

  • US 9924157 W
  • US 10427098 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0022496A2] A message (602) is encrypted with a first key E1 at the first computer (604). This is sent to a second computer, encrypted with a second key E2 (606), and sent back to the first computer. The first computer decrypts it with E1 (608) and sends it to the second computer. The second computer decrypts it with the second key.

[origin: WO0022496A2] Data can be securely transmitted between two computers over a network, such as the Internet, using anonymous keys that are private only to each user and are not shared with anyone else. The data is first encrypted at a first computer with a first private key into a first encrypted data file. The first encrypted data file is then transmitted to a second computer, wherein the first encrypted data file is encrypted with a second private key into a second encrypted data file. The second encrypted data file is then sent to the first computer, wherein the second encrypted data file is now decrypted with the first private key, known to the user at the first computer, into a third encrypted data file. The third encrypted data file is then sent to the second computer, wherein the third encrypted data file can not be fully decrypted into the original data file using the second private key. Associative properties of encryption and decryption are used and allow for the use of large private keys in order to obtain a high-level of security.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 9/00; G06F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 21/62 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 21/6209 (2013.01); G06F 2211/007 (2013.01); G06F 2211/008 (2013.01); G06F 2211/009 (2013.01); G06F 2221/2107 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0022496 A2 20000420; WO 0022496 A3 20000706; AT 456103 T 20100215; AU 1207200 A 20000501; AU 1207600 A 20000501; AU 1315100 A 20000501; AU 1706700 A 20000501; CA 2312967 A1 20000420; CA 2312967 C 20080205; CA 2312980 A1 20000420; CA 2312981 A1 20000420; CA 2313081 A1 20000420; DE 69941958 D1 20100311; EP 1038217 A1 20000927; EP 1038369 A2 20000927; EP 1040616 A1 20001004; EP 1040616 A4 20001227; EP 1125393 A1 20010822; EP 1125393 A4 20011219; EP 1125393 B1 20100120; IL 136745 D0 20010614; IL 136746 D0 20010614; IL 136747 D0 20010614; IL 136748 D0 20010614; WO 0022510 A1 20000420; WO 0022773 A1 20000420; WO 0022774 A1 20000420

INPADOC legal status


2009-03-04 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20081023

2006-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20061023

2000-12-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 04L 9/00 A, 7G 06F 1/00 B

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE