Global Patent Index - EP 1040663 A1

EP 1040663 A1 2000-10-04 - SCRAMBLING UNIT FOR A DIGITAL TRANSMISSION SYSTEM

Title (en)

SCRAMBLING UNIT FOR A DIGITAL TRANSMISSION SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERSCHLÜSSELUNGSEINHEIT FÜR DIGITALES ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

UNITE DE BROUILLAGE POUR SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION NUMERIQUE

Publication

EP 1040663 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98962647 A

Priority

  • EP 98962647 A
  • EP 97403150 A
  • IB 9802139 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0926894A1] An independant scrambling unit 1 for a digital audiovisual transmission system, the scrambling unit 1 comprising an input for receiving an assembled transport packet stream from a physically separate multiplexer 4, a scrambling device for scrambling the received transport stream according to a randomising control word and an output for sending the scrambled transport stream to a transmitter means for subsequent transmission. The scrambling unit 1 may also be used to introduce other packet data in the data stream. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/167

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/00 (2008.01); H04L 9/08 (2006.01); H04N 7/167 (2011.01); H04N 7/24 (2011.01); H04N 7/52 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 21/23611 (2013.01); H04N 7/1675 (2013.01); H04N 21/23608 (2013.01); H04N 21/23895 (2013.01); H04N 21/26606 (2013.01); H04N 21/26613 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9933271A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0926894 A1 19990630; AU 1777099 A 19990712; BR 9813618 A 20001017; CA 2311488 A1 19990701; CN 1174619 C 20041103; CN 1285114 A 20010221; EP 1040663 A1 20001004; HR P20000331 A2 20001231; HU 0101152 A2 20010730; HU 0101152 A3 20030428; ID 24906 A 20000831; IL 136955 D0 20010614; JP 2001527350 A 20011225; NO 20003247 A 20000823; NO 20003247 D0 20000621; PL 190503 B1 20051230; PL 341389 A1 20010409; RU 2212770 C2 20030920; TR 200001921 T2 20001221; WO 9933271 A1 19990701; ZA 9811812 B 19990817

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-18 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20081021

2007-08-03 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1030708

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2007-02-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NAGRA THOMSON LICENSING

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020916

2002-09-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CANAL+ TECHNOLOGIES

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000629;LT PAYMENT 20000629;LV PAYMENT 20000629;MK PAYMENT 20000629;RO PAYMENT 20000629;SI PAYMENT 20000629