Global Patent Index - EP 1040731 A1

EP 1040731 A1 2000-10-04 - POWER DEVICE FOR ILLUMINATED LIGHT BOX

Title (en)

POWER DEVICE FOR ILLUMINATED LIGHT BOX

Title (de)

SPEISESCHALTUNG EINES LEUCHTKASTENS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION POUR BOITE A LUMIERE

Publication

EP 1040731 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98959995 A

Priority

  • FR 9802739 W
  • FR 9715949 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2772525A1] The invention concerns powering devices for illuminated light boxes (102) for backlighting liquid crystal display screens, which consist in using a regulating boost DC/DC converter (204), directly powered by the 28 volt system for directly delivering the stabilised 50 volt direct current required for powering the illuminated light box. Said converter comprises an output diode (208) protecting the device. The power reserve is obtained by a capacitor (209) directly powered by the 50 volt current. A second converter (111) with galvanic insulation enables to obtain the power voltage allowance for powering the display screen lighted by the illuminated light box. The connection between these electronic control cards and the screen is produced by a galvanic insulation device (210). The invention enables to increase the powering device performance while reducing its weight, volume and price.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/29

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/285 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/2853 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9931940A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2772525 A1 19990618; FR 2772525 B1 20000317; DE 69802114 D1 20011122; DE 69802114 T2 20020606; EP 1040731 A1 20001004; EP 1040731 B1 20011017; ES 2163305 T3 20020116; US 6288912 B1 20010911; WO 9931940 A1 19990624

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061216

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070102

2008-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061216

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061215

2007-10-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070831

2007-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061215

2007-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2006-01-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060118

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051214

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051209

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051208

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020105

2002-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2163305 T3

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802114 20011122

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2001-09-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 05B 41/295 A

2001-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THALES AVIONICS S.A.

2000-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB