Global Patent Index - EP 1040732 A1

EP 1040732 A1 2000-10-04 - METHOD FOR DETECTING A LAMP CHANGE AND ELECTRONIC LAMP BALLAST FOR OPERATING GAS-DISCHARGE LAMPS USING SUCH A METHOD FOR DETECTING A LAMP CHANGE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DETECTING A LAMP CHANGE AND ELECTRONIC LAMP BALLAST FOR OPERATING GAS-DISCHARGE LAMPS USING SUCH A METHOD FOR DETECTING A LAMP CHANGE

Title (de)

LAMPENWECHSELERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN UND ELEKTRONISCHES VORSCHALTGERÄT ZUM BETREIBEN VON GASENTLADUNGSLAMPEN MIT HILFE EINES DERARTIGEN LAMPENWECHSELERKENNUNGSVERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DETECTION DE CHANGEMENT DE LAMPE ET BALLAST ELECTRONIQUE DESTINE AU FONCTIONNEMENT DE LAMPES A DECHARGE A L'AIDE D'UN TEL PROCEDE DE DETECTION DE CHANGEMENT DE LAMPE

Publication

EP 1040732 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98962359 A

Priority

  • DE 19757668 A
  • EP 9807427 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9934649A1] The invention relates to a method for detecting a change of gas-discharge lamp and to an electronic lamp ballast with such a method is used. To detect a lamp change a supply voltage of a certain frequency is applied to a load circuit (E) to which at least one gas-discharge lamp (G1, G2) is connected. The transient response of the load circuit (E) is monitored which is set in line with the supply voltage of a certain frequency being applied. On the basis of the transient response it is determined whether one of the gas-discharge lamps connected to the load circuit (E) has been cut off or whether all gas-discharge lamps (G1, G2) are correctly connected to said load circuit (E).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/29

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/298 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/2981 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9934649A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9934649 A1 19990708; AT 205359 T 20010915; AU 1755599 A 19990719; EP 1040732 A1 20001004; EP 1040732 B1 20010905; ES 2163903 T3 20020201; ZA 9811776 B 19990708

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59801412

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141119

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141119

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150129

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131119

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121120

2014-03-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140306

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131129

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121119

2013-08-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121120

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121119

2013-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 205359 T

- Effective date: 20121119

2013-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20121126

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-06-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111214

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111228

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20111130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20101124

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TRIDONIC BAUELEMENTE GMBH

- Free text: TRIDONIC BAUELEMENTE GMBH#SCHMELZHUETTERSTRASSE 34#6851 DORNBIRN (AT) -TRANSFER TO- TRIDONIC BAUELEMENTE GMBH#SCHMELZHUETTERSTRASSE 34#6851 DORNBIRN (AT)

2007-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2005-11-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20051117

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2163903 T3

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801412 20011011

2001-09-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-09-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 205359 T 20010915

2001-08-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 05B 41/00 A

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE