Global Patent Index - EP 1040768 A1

EP 1040768 A1 2000-10-04 - Sport shoe with soft frame

Title (en)

Sport shoe with soft frame

Title (de)

Sportschuh mit weicher Versteifungsstruktur

Title (fr)

Chaussure de sport à ossature souple

Publication

EP 1040768 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00104127 A

Priority

FR 9904297 A

Abstract (en)

The sports boot comprises an outer sole (4) and an outer ankle part (2) which encloses the user's foot and leg bottom. The o ankle part comprises a supple frame (10) made of a non-extendible supple material which is arranged along the favored force/supp directions and fixed to both the outer ankle part and the outer sole. The supple frame has a dorsal part (11) extending from the outer sole to the upper end of the outer ankle part and a lateral branch (15) connecting the dorsal upper end to a side of the b An Independent claim is also included for a sports boot.

Abstract (fr)

La chaussure comporte une semelle externe (4) et une tige externe (2) enveloppant le pied et le bas de la jambe de l'utilisateur. Elle est caractérisée en ce que la tige externe comporte une ossature souple (10) en un matériau souple sensiblement non extensible, disposé selon des directions d'efforts/d'appuis privilégiés et solidaires à la fois de la tige externe (2) et de la semelle externe (4). L'ossature souple (10) comporte une partie dorsale (11) s'étendant depuis la semelle externe (4) jusqu'à sensiblement l'extrémité supérieure de la tige externe (2) et au moins une branche latérale (15) reliant latéralement l'extrémité supérieure (14) de la partie dorsale (11) à un côté de la chaussure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04; A43B 7/20; A43C 11/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 23/08 (2006.01); A43B 5/00 (2006.01); A43B 5/04 (2006.01); A43B 7/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/0405 (2013.01); A43B 5/0401 (2013.01); A43B 5/0482 (2013.01); A43B 7/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2902735 A1 20071228 - PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1040768 A1 20001004; FR 2791528 A1 20001006; FR 2791528 B1 20010518; JP 2000287712 A 20001017; JP 4767387 B2 20110907; US 2002062579 A1 20020530

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050901

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030221

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010130

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI