Global Patent Index - EP 1040772 A1

EP 1040772 A1 2000-10-04 - Key holder for collapsible key for motor vehicles

Title (en)

Key holder for collapsible key for motor vehicles

Title (de)

Schlüsselhalter mit herausklappbarem Schlüssel für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Porte-clef à clef escamotable pour véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1040772 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400851 A

Priority

FR 9903894 A

Abstract (en)

The key consists of a casing containing an electronic circuit with components (32) on a printed board (30) and a shank (38) which projects from the casing. The shank is connected to the casing by a pivot (46) so it can be retracted into a slot (36) inside it when not in use. The outer wall of the slot has a recess (42) in one edge and the shank has a notch in one side to facilitate it extraction.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention propose un porte-clef (10) comportant un boîtier (12) et une clef (38) montée pivotante entre une position de rangement dans laquelle elle est escamotée dans un logement (36) du boîtier et une position sortie d'utilisation qui est décalée angulairement d'environ 180° par rapport à la position de rangement, du type dans lequel l'axe (A, 46) de pivotement de la clef (38) est agencé au voisinage d'un angle (20-24) du boîtier (12), et du type dans lequel la clef comporte un corps ou tige de clef (38) dont une extrémité (44) est montée pivotante par rapport au boîtier (12) autour dudit axe (A), caractérisé en ce que la tige de clef (38) est plate, et en ce que l'axe de pivotement (A) est perpendiculaire au plan de la tige de clef plate (38). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45C 11/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 11/32 (2006.01); E05B 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45C 11/324 (2013.01); E05B 19/043 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4226579 A1 19940217 - DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1040772 A1 20001004; EP 1040772 B1 20030903; AR 023179 A1 20020904; BR 0001503 A 20001010; DE 60004909 D1 20031009; DE 60004909 T2 20040715; ES 2206152 T3 20040516; FR 2791530 A1 20001006; FR 2791530 B1 20010518; UY 26087 A1 20001031

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170428

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160328

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160328

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160328

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60004909

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150316

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150311

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-03-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60004909

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2206152 T3

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60004909 P 20031009

2003-09-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI