Global Patent Index - EP 1040777 A1

EP 1040777 A1 2000-10-04 - Improvements in the manufacture of stackable deckchairs

Title (en)

Improvements in the manufacture of stackable deckchairs

Title (de)

Verbesserungen beim herstellen von stapelbaren liegemöbeln

Title (fr)

Améliorations pour la fabrication de chaises-longues empilables

Publication

EP 1040777 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99500051 A

Priority

  • EP 99500051 A
  • ES 9800328 A

Abstract (en)

The invention improves the articulation means (28) between the framework (1) and the backrest (2) which is adjustable by lowering. The asymmetric V-shaped supports (3) and (4) prevent unbalances in the deckchair when the load is not centred on the framework (1), preventing user accidents. The backrest (2) is held lowered on a horizontal plane overlying the plane of the frame (1) due to a crosspiece (23), providing a hand clearance, preventing hands from being trapped. Means (23) are also provided to eventually lock the frame (2) in its lowered position. The invention applies to stackable deckchairs made of a metallic material or synthetic resins, of the kind having a seat consisting of a fabric tightened by a lashing or based on slats. <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/14; A47C 5/06; A47C 20/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/14 (2006.01); A47C 3/04 (2006.01); A47C 5/06 (2006.01); A47C 20/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/143 (2013.01); A47C 3/04 (2013.01); A47C 5/06 (2013.01); A47C 20/043 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1040777 A1 20001004; EP 1040777 B1 20020807; AT 221743 T 20020815; DE 69902437 D1 20020912; DE 69902437 T2 20030710; ES 2160440 A1 20011101; ES 2160440 B1 20020501

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170331

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-10-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090330

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090331

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080513

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080318

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030330

2003-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-03-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030330

2003-03-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030330

2003-02-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-11-22 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021122

2002-09-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69902437 20020912

2002-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

2002-08-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-08-07 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-08-07 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-08-07 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-08-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-08-07 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 221743 T 20020815

2002-03-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: STACKABLE LOUNGER

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010716

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001212

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI