Global Patent Index - EP 1040866 A1

EP 1040866 A1 2000-10-04 - An apparatus for batching liquids

Title (en)

An apparatus for batching liquids

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Dosieren von Flüssigkeiten

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le dosage de liquides

Publication

EP 1040866 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830146 A

Priority

EP 99830146 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus for batching liquids comprises a plurality of dispenser valves (6) arranged circumferentially on a horizontal plane. A base (7) predisposed below the dispenser valves (6) is commanded to rotate by a motor group (11, 12) solid in rotation with the base (7) about a vertical axis (x-x). The base (7) bears a balance (16) for weighing a recipient (15) collecting batched liquids. By effect of rotations of the base (7) the recipient (15) can be positioned selectively below the valves to receive the liquids to be batched. An organ (17), solid in rotation with the rotatable base (7), can open the dispenser valves (6). The apparatus can be used to batch paints, solvents and additives precisely and rapidly, and is particularly suitable for instantaneous preparation of paint products. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 13/10 (2006.01); B01F 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 15/0445 (2013.01); B01F 13/1058 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

IT MO970126 A 19970709

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1040866 A1 20001004; EP 1040866 B1 20030604; DE 69908547 D1 20030710; ES 2198874 T3 20040201

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090317

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090318

2010-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090318

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080329

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080418

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2198874 T3

2003-09-05 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-09-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-09-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: EUROMECCANICA S.R.L.

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908547 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT

2003-06-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020610

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT PT

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010326

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI