Global patent index - EP 1040867 A2

EP 1040867 A2 2000-10-04 - Process and apparatus for the continuous treatment of catalysts and catalyst carriers

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for the continuous treatment of catalysts and catalyst carriers

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur kontinuierlichen Behandlung von Katalysatoren und Katalysatorträgern

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour le traitement en continu de catalyseurs et supports de catalyseurs

Publication

EP 1040867 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106284 A

Priority

DE 19914751 A

Abstract (en)

Continuous treatment (i.e. activation or calcination) of a catalyst or catalyst support in an apparatus is such that (a) the physical and/or chemical conditions change during entry into and/or exit from the apparatus; and/or (b) the catalyst/support is transported into the apparatus through zones (5, 6, 7) which have different physical and/or chemical conditions.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zur Behandlung von Katalysatoren oder Katalysatorträgern in einer Vorrichtung, wobei die Behandlung in der Weise kontinuierlich durchgeführt wird, dass sich während des Eintritts des Katalysators oder des Katalysatorträgers in die Vorrichtung und/oder während seines Austritts aus der Vorrichtung die physikalischen und/oder chemischen Bedingungen ändern und/oder der Katalysator oder der Katalysatorträger in der Vorrichtung durch Zonen (5, 6, 7) unterschiedlicher physikalischer und/oder chemischer Bedingungen transportiert wird. Gegenüber dem bisher ausgeübten diskontinuierlichen Verfahren besteht der Vorteil, dass bei der Behandlung keine langen Abkühl- und Aufheizperioden zu verzeichnen sind und dass Material gleichmäßigerer Qualität erzeugt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01J 8/12; B01J 8/24; B01J 8/26; B01J 8/36; B01J 8/38; B01J 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 37/08 (2006.01); B01J 8/10 (2006.01); B01J 8/26 (2006.01); B01J 8/46 (2006.01); B01J 19/18 (2006.01); B01J 19/22 (2006.01); B01J 37/00 (2006.01); B65G 53/22 (2006.01); C08F 4/78 (2006.01); C08F 10/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65G 53/22 (2013.01); B01J 8/10 (2013.01); B01J 8/26 (2013.01); B01J 8/46 (2013.01); B01J 19/18 (2013.01); B01J 19/22 (2013.01); B01J 37/00 (2013.01); C08F 10/00 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00033 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00132 (2013.01); Y10S 526/905 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C08F 10/00 + C08F 4/24

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1040867 A2 20001004; EP 1040867 A3 20010425; EP 1040867 B1 20060809; DE 19914751 A1 20001005; DE 50013288 D1 20060921; JP 2000288409 A 20001017; US 6559087 B1 20030506

INPADOC legal status

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BASELL POLYOLEFINE G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070510

2007-03-07 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20060809

2007-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2006-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50013288

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-09-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2006-08-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060809

2006-08-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060809

2006-08-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060809

2005-07-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-09-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FEINDT, HANS-JACOB, DR.

2004-09-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KARER, RAINER

2004-09-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ROSENDORFER, PHILIPP, DR.

2004-09-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: EVERTZ, KASPAR, DR.

2004-09-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MICKLITZ, WOLFGANG, DR.

2004-09-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DE LANGE, PAULUS, DR.

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031111

2002-07-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB IT NL

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011025

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 01J 8/08 A, 7B 01J 8/10 B, 7B 01J 8/12 B, 7B 01J 8/18 B, 7B 01J 8/24 B, 7B 01J 8/26 B, 7B 01J 8/36 B, 7C 08F 4/24 B

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI