Global patent index - EP 1040872 A1

EP 1040872 A1 2000-10-04 - Tube mill

Title (en)

Tube mill

Title (de)

Rohrmühle

Title (fr)

Broyeur tubulaire

Publication

EP 1040872 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00106197 A

Priority

DE 19914288 A

Abstract (en)

The housing around the exit end of the milling tube (10) comprises two fixed, non-rotating, spaced apart side walls (18, 19) with a rotatable conveyor ring (20) in between. A screening region (23) is incorporated into the space between the mill tube exit opening(s) (17) and conveyor ring, in between the two side walls. An inlet opening for screening air and an exit opening (26) fo screening air and fine production fraction (29) are provided in at least one of the side walls.

Abstract (de)

Um eine Rohrmühle so zu gestalten, daß mit ihr mit geringem maschinellen Aufwand eine einfach und kompakt gebaute Kreislaufmahleinrichtung geschaffen werden kann, die auch höhere Gutkreislaufraten ohne große Betriebskosten bewältigen kann, wird erfindungsgemäß eine Rohrmühle vorgeschlagen, deren Gutausfallgehäuse aus zwei beabstandeten feststehenden nicht rotierenden Seiten-Stirnwänden (18, 19) besteht, zwischen denen ein drehbar gelagerter in Drehung versetzbarer Materialförderring (20) angeordnet ist, wobei in diesem derartig ausgebildeten Gutausfallgehäuse ein Sichtraum (23) mit einem dynamischen Sichter (31) und/oder statischen Sichter integriert ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 17/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 17/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 17/1845 (2013.01); B02C 17/189 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0184326 B1 19890118

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1040872 A1 20001004; EP 1040872 B1 20061108; DE 19914288 A1 20001005; DE 19914288 B4 20070726; DE 50013709 D1 20061221; DK 1040872 T3 20070319; US 6299081 B1 20011009

INPADOC legal status

2009-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-11-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070312

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-10-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070809

2007-08-29 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KHD HUMBOLDT WEDAG GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2007-06-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2007-03-15 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070315

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50013709

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-12-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR

2005-07-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KHD HUMBOLDT WEDAG GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE DK FR

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010320

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI