Global Patent Index - EP 1040878 A2

EP 1040878 A2 2000-10-04 - Method and device for rolling a metal strip, in particular a split metal strip

Title (en)

Method and device for rolling a metal strip, in particular a split metal strip

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Walzen eines Metallbandes, insbesondere eines gespaltenen Metallbandes

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour le laminage d'une bande métallique, en particulier d'une bande métallique divisée

Publication

EP 1040878 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105657 A

Priority

DE 19914988 A

Abstract (en)

Metal strip rolling, using a rolling force quotient (FA/FB) of one to two times the force application point to strip centerl distance quotient (IA/IB), is new. Metal strip is rolled using applied roll end forces (FA, FB) adjusted such that their quotient (FA/FB) is one to two times reciprocal value of the quotient (IA/IB) of the distances (IA, IB) between their respective application points (A, B) at the rol ends and the centerline (14) of the metal strip cross-section. An Independent claim is also included for equipment for carrying the above process.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Walzen eines Metallbandes (12), insbesondere eines gespaltenen Metallbandes, mittels eines Walzgerüstes mit einer Walze (10), auf deren Walzenenden Walzkräfte (FA, FB) ausgeübt werden. Dabei werden die auf die Walzenenden wirkenden Walzkräfte (FA, FB) derart eingestellt, daß ihr Quotient (FA/FB) zwischen Eins und dem Zweifachen des Kehrwerts des Quotienten (lA/lB) der Abstände (lA, lB) zwischen ihrem jeweiligen Eingriffspunkt (A, B) auf ein Walzenende und der Mittellinie (14) des Querschnitts des Metallbandes (12) liegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 37/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/58 (2006.01); B21B 37/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/58 (2013.01); B21B 37/68 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1040878 A2 20001004; EP 1040878 A3 20030115; EP 1040878 B1 20040609; AT 268649 T 20040615; DE 19914988 A1 20001005

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50006716

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140519

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130317

2014-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2013-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 268649 T

- Effective date: 20130317

2013-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEMENS A.G.

- Effective date: 20130331

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120207

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120411

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2007-11-28 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20070719

2005-05-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Effective date: 20050309

2005-01-12 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006716 P 20040715

2004-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE

2003-11-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-10-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE

2003-10-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE FR

2003-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030602

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI