Global Patent Index - EP 1040894 A2

EP 1040894 A2 2000-10-04 - Cutting device for rewinding machine

Title (en)

Cutting device for rewinding machine

Title (de)

Schneidvorrichtung für Umwickelmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de coupe pour rebobineuse

Publication

EP 1040894 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00102853 A

Priority

IT MI990642 A

Abstract (en)

A cutting device for a rewinding machine comprising an unwinding assembly to unwind a reel of sheet or web material (10) of large diameter, a winding assembly to wind the web (10) into final rolls of smaller diameter and a cutting assembly (1) comprising a cutting roller (2) on which is mounted a mobile blade (15) able to bring said web (10) into contact with cutting blades (23) fixedly mounted on the frame of the machine, in a cusp-shaped configuration. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 1/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/38 (2006.01); B26D 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 5/02 (2013.01); B26D 1/385 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1040894 A2 20001004; EP 1040894 A3 20030611; EP 1040894 B1 20050817; DE 60021941 D1 20050922; DE 60021941 T2 20060614; ES 2247965 T3 20060316; IT 1312033 B1 20020404; IT MI990642 A1 20000929

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080211

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080212

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080211

2009-05-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080212

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080211

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070226

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060216

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-10-23 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-02-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070226

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070215

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070214

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070212

2006-07-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060518

2006-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2247965 T3

2006-02-16 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060216

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-12-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-09-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60021941 P 20050922

2005-08-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-08-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-03-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PAPER CONVERTING MACHINE COMPANY ITALIA S.P.A.

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 26D 1/38 A

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 26D 5/02 B

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 19/26 B

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI