Global Patent Index - EP 1040898 A2

EP 1040898 A2 2000-10-04 - Knife shaft holding means for the knife of a machine for slicing salmon

Title (en)

Knife shaft holding means for the knife of a machine for slicing salmon

Title (de)

Messerwellen-Aufnahmeeinheit für Messer einer Lachsschneidemaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour supporter l'axe du couteau d'une machine pour trancher du saumon

Publication

EP 1040898 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105751 A

Priority

DE 29905889 U

Abstract (en)

The shaft (10) carrying the rotating knife is held in a double roller bearing with a cylindrical housing (200) set in a thic bearing plate (210). The inside surface of the housing is stepped and accommodates two outer races (13,14), with conical rollers, set at an angl the bearing axis, running in inner races on the shaft. There is a sealing ring on the end of the shaft carrying the knife. A dri pinion (18) is fastened to the other end of the shaft.

Abstract (de)

Messerwellen-Aufnahmeeinheit für ein horizontales Messer (10) einer sich drehenden Hauptlagerronde (210) einer Lachsschneidemaschine. Eine vertikal ausgerichtete Messerwelle (10) weist an ihrem oberen Ende das Messer und an ihrem unteren Ende das Antriebsritzel (24) auf und ist in Kegelrollenlagern (13, 14) drehbar gelagert. Die äußeren Lagerringe der Kegelrollenlager (13, 14) sind in einem zylindrischen Gehäuse (200) in der Hauptlagerronde (210) befestigt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/147 (2006.01); B26D 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/16 (2013.01); B26D 1/147 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29905889 U1 19990923; EP 1040898 A2 20001004; EP 1040898 A3 20030528

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031129

2004-03-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 26D 7/26 A

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 26D 1/147 B

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI