Global Patent Index - EP 1040911 A2

EP 1040911 A2 2000-10-04 - PROCESS AND MACHINE FOR MAKING CONTAINERS FROM A PLURALITY OF STRIPS AND CONTAINER

Title (en)

PROCESS AND MACHINE FOR MAKING CONTAINERS FROM A PLURALITY OF STRIPS AND CONTAINER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON BEHÄLTERN AUS EINER VIELZAHL VON STREIFEN UND BEHÄLTER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE RECIPIENTS, DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION ET RECIPIENT AINSI OBTENU

Publication

EP 1040911 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98959915 A

Priority

  • ES 9800342 W
  • ES 9702710 A

Abstract (en)

The process comprises the stages of: gluing of said plurality of strips from rolls of sheet material (1a, 1b, 1c, 1d); die-cutting of said plurality of strips; and pressing and joining together of said strips to form the container according to a design predetermined individually for each strip, by adding progressively to a first strip already pressed other further individual strips as they are pressed onto them. The machine comprises: gluing stations (2); die-cutting stations (3) which die-cut a plurality of strips; pressing stations (4), on which all the strips are joined together; and transfer means (6) for transferring the strip(s) already pressed from one pressing station (4) to the others. Much stronger containers can be achieved without thickness limitation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 7/00 (2006.01); B31B 7/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31B 1/00 (2013.01); B31B 2201/2654 (2013.01); B31B 2217/0038 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1040911 A2 20001004; EP 1040911 B1 20011107; AT 208264 T 20011115; AU 1564499 A 19990705; DE 69802438 D1 20011213; ES 2149671 A1 20001101; ES 2149671 B1 20010401; WO 9930897 A2 19990624; WO 9930897 A3 19990910

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021215

2002-12-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021215

2002-10-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020530

2002-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-02-08 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020208

2002-02-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-02-07 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802438 20011213

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IT NL PT

2001-11-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 208264 T 20011115

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010226

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IT NL PT