Global Patent Index - EP 1040921 A1

EP 1040921 A1 2000-10-04 - Surface for machine parts in printing machines

Title (en)

Surface for machine parts in printing machines

Title (de)

Oberfläche für Maschinenteile in Druckmaschinen

Title (fr)

Surface pour pièces de machine dans machines d'impression

Publication

EP 1040921 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00105146 A

Priority

DE 19914136 A

Abstract (en)

The surfacing may be used on paper guide cylinders and other components. It consists of a layer with self-cleaning propertie This layer has a micro-structured surface. The surface structure has a spacing of 5-50 mu m and a height of 5-20 mu m. It may be the form of a lacquer sprayed onto the component.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Oberfläche für Maschinenteile in Druckmaschinen, die mit Farbe und/oder Wasser in Berührung kommen und dadurch farbverschmutzen können und/oder bei denen die Gefahr der Verschmutzung durch Schmutzpartikel besteht. Die Aufgabe der Erfindung, eine Oberfläche für Maschinenteile in Druckmaschinen zu schaffen, die Schmutz jeder Art, wie beispielsweise Farbe, Papierstaub u.ä. selbständig abweist, wird dadurch gelöst, dass die Leitelemente für die Bogenführung eine Oberfläche aufweist, die aus einer mit Selbstreinigungsfähigkeit bestehenden Beschichtung besteht, die eine mikrostrukturierte Oberfläche aufweist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 22/00; B41F 13/08; B41N 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 22/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 22/00 (2013.01); B41N 7/00 (2013.01); B41N 2207/02 (2013.01); B41N 2207/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19914136 A1 20000928; DE 19914136 B4 20090226; DE 50015248 D1 20080821; EP 1040921 A1 20001004; EP 1040921 B1 20080709

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-29 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20100822

2010-12-29 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20100822

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100320

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100322

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100402

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20090406

2009-05-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MANROLAND AG

- Effective date: 20090407

2008-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015248 P 20080821

2008-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061219

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000807

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI