Global Patent Index - EP 1040932 A1

EP 1040932 A1 2000-10-04 - Ink ribbon cassette capable of being recycled

Title (en)

Ink ribbon cassette capable of being recycled

Title (de)

Wiederverwertbare Farbbandkassette

Title (fr)

Cassette à ruban encreur capable d'être recyclée

Publication

EP 1040932 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00302500 A

Priority

JP 8827099 A

Abstract (en)

The upper case (18) can be divided into a first case (19) positioned at the ribbon drawing section and a second case (20) having shaft bearing sections (20a) capable of pivoting the first reel (16) comprised of a take-up reel and the second reel (17) comprised of a supply reel, for example, and the second case (20) is removably attached to the lower case (11) and then the ink ribbon (15) already used can be replaced with an ink ribbon not yet used under a state in which the second case is removed from the lower case. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 32/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 32/00 (2006.01); B41J 35/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 35/28 (2013.01); B41J 32/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1040932 A1 20001004; EP 1040932 B1 20020904; CN 1139495 C 20040225; CN 1268444 A 20001004; DE 60000381 D1 20021010; DE 60000381 T2 20030109; JP 2000280586 A 20001010

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060327

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-03-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060327

2005-05-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050517

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-03-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050317

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050224

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000381 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020116

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000624

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI