Global patent index - EP 1040934 A2

EP 1040934 A2 2000-10-04 - Recording medium for ink jet printer

Title (en)

Recording medium for ink jet printer

Title (de)

Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsmedium

Title (fr)

Milieu d'enregistrement par jet d'encre

Publication

EP 1040934 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00106959 A

Priority

JP 9584699 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a recording medium for ink jet printers in which superior image recording quality and color stability are exhibited. In a recording medium for ink jet printers in which an ink receiving layer contained at least pigment and binder resin is provided on a supporting material, partially saponified PVA having a degree of saponification of 85.0 to 73.0 mol % and a degree of polymerization of 300 to 1500, is contained in the ink receiving layer as a color stability improving component.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/00 (2006.01); B41M 5/50 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01); G03G 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/5254 (2013.01); B41M 5/506 (2013.01); B41M 5/52 (2013.01); B41M 5/5227 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1040934 A2 20001004; EP 1040934 A3 20011219; EP 1040934 B1 20040721; DE 60012254 D1 20040826; DE 60012254 T2 20041118; JP 2000280600 A 20001010; JP 3458068 B2 20031020; KR 100417160 B1 20040205; KR 20010014679 A 20010226; US 6815021 B1 20041109

INPADOC legal status

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60012254

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160208

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150220

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION, JP

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20121106

2012-10-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120927 AND 20121003

2012-03-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SEIKO EPSON CORP., JP

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 60012254

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120207

2012-03-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SEIKO EPSON CORP., JP

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 60012254

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120207

2012-03-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60012254

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: EISENFUEHR SPEISER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAEL, DE

- Effective date: 20120207

2012-02-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60012254

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: EISENFUEHR, SPEISER & PARTNER, DE

2005-07-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050422

2005-04-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-08-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60012254

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-08-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-07-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-07-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ISHIKAWA, TAKAYUKIC/O PULP AND PAPER DIVISION

2004-07-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KUBOTA, NOBUHIROC/O PULP AND PAPER DIVISION

2004-07-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TSUCHIDA, MINORUC/O PULP AND PAPER DIVISION

2004-07-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ASAI, SHIGEKIC/O PULP AND PAPER DIVISION

2004-07-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: YOSHIMOTO, TAKESHIC/O PULP AND PAPER DIVISION

2004-07-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: IWAMOTO, KIYOSHIC/O PULP AND PAPER DIVISION

2004-07-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SUGIYAMA, JUNC/O SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION

2004-07-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ONISHI, HIROYUKIC/O SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION

2004-07-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SANO, YUKARIC/O SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION

2002-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020823

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2002-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020527

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI