Global Patent Index - EP 1040965 A1

EP 1040965 A1 2000-10-04 - Vehicle sound system and initialisation method

Title (en)

Vehicle sound system and initialisation method

Title (de)

Soundsystem für ein Kraftfahrzeug und Verfahren zur Initialisierung eines solchen

Title (fr)

Système sonore pour un véhicule et méthode d'initialisation

Publication

EP 1040965 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00102487 A

Priority

DE 19914805 A

Abstract (en)

The sound system has a control unit, input units (3,3a), a display unit, a source data generating unit, an amplifier unit wi one or more loudspeakers, a bus (8) connecting the units and at least one unit (3-6,10,11) with a memory (9) containing its functional scope, which can be transmitted over the bus for use in deriving the functional scope of the entire system. The input units have a memory (12) containing an input unit priority value that can be fed to the other units (4-6,10,11) over the bus. A sets its functional scope depending on the priority value and feeds to the input unit with the corresponding priority value, whi can use it to form its functional scope. Independent claims are also included for the use of the sound system and for a method of determining the functional scope o audio system.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Audiosoundsystem für ein Kraftfahrzeug und ein Verfahren zur Festlegung des Funktionsumfanges eines solchen. Das Audiosoundsystem (1) für ein Kraftfahrzeug zeigt eine Steuereinheit (2), und mehrere Eingabeeinheiten (3, 3a) zur Bedienung des Systems (1) sowie Anzeigeeinheiten (4) und mehrere Einheiten (5, 11) zur Generierung von Quelldaten in Form von Audio- oder Videodaten. Die Audiodaten werden in einer Verstärkereinheit (6) verstärkt und mehreren Lautsprechern (7) zugeführt. Die Einheiten sind über ein Bus (8) mit ringförmiger Topologie miteinander verbunden. Über den Bus werden sowohl Quell- als auch Steuerdaten übertragen. Der Funktionsumfang der einzelnen Eingabeeinheiten (3, 3a) wird anhand eines Prioritätswertes der Eingabeeinheiten (3, 3a) festgelegt. Dieser Prioritätswert ist in dem Speicher (12) in jeder Eingabeeinheit (3, 3a) eingespeichert. Mit einem Steuerbefehl, der diesen Prioritätswert enthält, werden die anderen Einheiten des Systems (1) veranlasst, einen prioritätswertabhängig gebildeten Funktionsumfang, der eine Teilmenge des gesamten Funktionsumfangs dieser Einheit darstellt, zu bilden und an die betreffende Eingabeeinheit (3, 3a) rückzuübertragen. Diese generiert dann aus den ihr zugeführten prioritätswertabhängig gebildeten Funktionsumfängen ihren Funktionsumfang. Dieser Funktionsumfang umfasst dann alle Funktionalitäten, die durch diese Eingabeeinheit (3, 3a) auslösbar sind. Da die verschiedenen Eingabeeinheiten (3, 3a) unterschiedliche Prioritätswerte aufweisen, zeigen diese auch unterschiedliche Funktionsumfänge, wodurch Kollisionen in der Steuerung des Systems weitgehend ausgeschlossen sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 16/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 11/02 (2006.01); B60R 16/02 (2006.01); H04L 12/42 (2006.01); H04S 3/00 (2006.01); H05K 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04S 3/002 (2013.01); H04R 5/04 (2013.01); H04R 2499/13 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1040965 A1 20001004; EP 1040965 B1 20030502; DE 19914805 A1 20001005; DE 19914805 C2 20010426; DE 50001932 D1 20030605; US 2007030981 A1 20070208; US 7039196 B1 20060502; US 7512244 B2 20090331

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160205

2016-11-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20161028

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150217

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150225

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-12-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50001932

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001028

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI