Global Patent Index - EP 1040996 A2

EP 1040996 A2 2000-10-04 - Platform for ships and installations on water

Title (en)

Platform for ships and installations on water

Title (de)

Plattform für Schiffe und Einrichtungen auf dem Wasser

Title (fr)

Plate-forme pour navires et pour installations sur plans d'eau

Publication

EP 1040996 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104730 A

Priority

DE 19915092 A

Abstract (en)

The platform for ships and floating installations, comprising at least one beam of self contained support structure (4) carr a bearing plate (7), is characterized by the fact that the beam or support structure and/or the bearing plate are made of a fibe reinforced plastic material.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft Plattformen, insbesondere als Balkonböden für Schiffe, vorzugsweise Passagierschiffe, sowie auf dem Wasser befindliche Einrichtungen, insbesondere Arbeits-, Wohn- oder Bohrplattformen oder Wohn- Hotel- und Gastronomieschiffe. Die Plattform für Schiffe und Einrichtungen auf dem Wasser besteht aus mindestens einer freitragenden Struktureinheit oder einem Träger (4) und einer darauf angeordneten Auflage (7), wobei die freitragende Struktureinheit oder der Träger (4) und/oder die Auflage (7) aus faserverstärktem Kunststoff ausgeführt sind. Die Auflage (7) besteht vorzugsweise aus einer Platte, die mindestens zwei Lagen (1,6) aus faserverstärktem Kunststoff aufweist, wobei zwischen den Lagen Abstandshalter (3) oder ein oder mehrere Hartschaumkerne (2) angeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 3/48; B63B 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 5/24 (2006.01); B63B 3/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 5/24 (2013.01); B63B 3/48 (2013.01); B63B 2231/50 (2013.01); B63B 2231/52 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FI FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1040996 A2 20001004; EP 1040996 A3 20020724; EP 1040996 B1 20051012; DE 19915092 A1 20001012; DE 50011311 D1 20060223; DK 1040996 T3 20060213; ES 2249205 T3 20060401

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120305

2013-10-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20131030

2013-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120304

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-01-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50011311

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-11-05 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2012-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120304

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110328

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110325

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110325

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110404

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110314

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110315

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-09-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060713

2006-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2249205

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-02-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50011311

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-02-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-02-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2005-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR IT

2005-09-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HOWALDTSWERKE-DEUTSCHE WERFT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-04-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR IT

2003-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-10-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI