Global Patent Index - EP 1040997 A1

EP 1040997 A1 2000-10-04 - Device for balancing a vessel

Title (en)

Device for balancing a vessel

Title (de)

Anordnung zur Balancierung eines Fahrzeuges

Title (fr)

Installation de balance d'un navire

Publication

EP 1040997 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00201160 A

Priority

NL 1011728 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a device (14) for balancing a vessel (13), characterized in that the device (14) is provided with: at least one body (1) with a certain mass, which body is movable substantially in transverse direction of the vessel; drive means (6) for moving the body; measuring means (12) for measuring the angle of inclination of the vessel relative to the horizon; and control means (15) for operating the drive means at a first value of the angle of inclination measured by the measuring means, which first values does not equal zero, for moving the body to a position of balance in which the angle of inclination has a second value which is preferably substantially equal to zero. The invention also relates to a vessel, such as a container ship, provided with such a device. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 39/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 39/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1040997 A1 20001004; NL 1011728 C2 20001003

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041104

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010326

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI