Global Patent Index - EP 1041009 A2

EP 1041009 A2 2000-10-04 - Container and closure cap

Title (en)

Container and closure cap

Title (de)

Behälter und Verschlusskappe

Title (fr)

Récipient et capuchon de fermeture

Publication

EP 1041009 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00302681 A

Priority

GB 9907338 A

Abstract (en)

A container and closure cap therefor comprises a container having an open-ended and externally threaded cylindrical neck (4), a closure cap (2) and a liner disc (12) located in the cap and adapted to form a seal with the open end of the container neck. Spacing means (13) are formed on the end wall of the closure cap to hold the outer region (122) of the liner disc spaced from the end wall of the cap so that it can deflect resiliently when the cap is screwed onto the container. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/04 (2006.01); B65D 51/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/20 (2013.01); B65D 41/045 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0018 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0093 (2013.01); B65D 2251/065 (2013.01); B65D 2251/07 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041009 A2 20001004; EP 1041009 A3 20011121; GB 9907338 D0 19990526

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-09-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI