Global Patent Index - EP 1041026 A2

EP 1041026 A2 2000-10-04 - Device for contact-free turning a running web

Title (en)

Device for contact-free turning a running web

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum berührungslosen Umlenken einer bewegten Bahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour devier sans contact une bande en mouvement

Publication

EP 1041026 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104625 A

Priority

DE 19915120 A

Abstract (en)

The device for turning a moving web (2) of paper or cardboard without contact using an air cushion comprises a housing with curved outer wall (3) over which the web passes. Air is blown through outlets (4) in the wall to produce the air cushion. Cover plates (12, 13) on either side of the housing extend to within 5 -30 mm of the web and cover the same breadth of it.

Abstract (de)

Zum berührungslosen Umlenken einer bewegten Bahn (2), insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn, mittels eines Luftpolsters sind Vorrichtungen bekannt, die ein sich über die Bahnbreite erstreckendes Gehäuse (1) aufweisen, an das ein Gebläse zur Erzeugung des Luftpolsters angeschlossen ist. Die äußere Wandfläche einer Begrenzungswand (3) des Gehäuses verläuft als Führungsfläche für die Bahn (2) gekrümmt und weist Luftaustrittsöffnungen (4) auf. Nach der Erfindung ist an der Bahnzulaufseite und/oder der Bahnablaufseite eine Abdeckplatte (12, 13) angeordnet, die sich vom Gehäuse (1) in Richtung zur Bahn (2) erstreckt und die in einem Abstand zwischen 5 mm und 30 mm von der Bahn (2) endet. Die Abdeckplatte (12, 13) reicht im wesentlichen über die gesamte Bahnbreite. Die Abdeckplatte (12, 13) bewirkt einen stabilen, flatterfreien Bahnlauf . <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 23/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 23/24 (2006.01); B65H 23/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 23/24 (2013.01); B65H 23/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041026 A2 20001004; EP 1041026 A3 20010418; EP 1041026 B1 20030716; DE 19915120 A1 20001005; ES 2203360 T3 20040416

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130303

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50002886

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130303

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120304

2013-07-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130710

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120303

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110328

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110325

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110404

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-07-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2203360 T3

2004-03-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002886 P 20030821

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-07-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010324

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 23/32 A, 7B 65H 23/24 B

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI