Global Patent Index - EP 1041027 A2

EP 1041027 A2 2000-10-04 - Device for conveying signatures in a printing machine

Title (en)

Device for conveying signatures in a printing machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Transportieren von Signaturen in Druckmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour transporter des signatures dans une machine d'imprimerie

Publication

EP 1041027 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104588 A

Priority

US 28287099 A

Abstract (en)

Each of several toothed belt drives (1,1') has a pair of counter-opposed drive belts, all driven by pulleys (2,2',3,3') with semi-elliptically shaped toothless external surface. The toothed belt drives can move in two directions. In a first horizontal direction signatures (S) are moved forwards and can be slowed down. In a second vertical direction the toothed belt drives are pulled back from contact with the signatures.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung und ein Verfahren zur Vorwärtsbewegung und/oder Verlangsamung von Signaturen in einer Druckmaschine. Es ist eine Anzahl von zwei oder mehreren Riemenantrieben vorgesehen, wobei jeder Riemenantrieb mindestens ein Paar von gegenüber einander angeordneten Riemen umfaßt. Die Riemen sind vorzugsweise Zahnriemen (1, 1'), die von Zahnriemenscheiben (2, 2', 3, 3') angetrieben werden. Die Zahnriemenscheiben weisen eine semi-elliptisch geformte zahnlose Außenfläche auf. Dadurch können die Zahnriemen in zwei Richtungen bewegt werden. In der ersten Richtung, die horizontal verläuft, werden die Signaturen vorwärts bewegt, und in dieser Richtung können die Signaturen verlangsamt werden. In der zweiten Richtung, die senkrecht verläuft, werden die Zahnriemen zurückgezogen, d. h. außer Kontakt mit den Signaturen (S) gebracht, um während einer Geschwindigkeitsübertragung oder während eines Übergangs der Signaturen (S) zwischen zwei aufeinanderfolgenden Riemenpaaren ein Stauchen oder Zerknittern der Signaturen (S) zu verhindern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/12; B65H 29/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/54 (2006.01); B65H 20/20 (2006.01); B65H 29/12 (2006.01); B65H 29/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/68 (2013.01); B65H 29/12 (2013.01); B65H 2404/242 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1932 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041027 A2 20001004; EP 1041027 A3 20021016; EP 1041027 B1 20031105; DE 10012255 A1 20001005; DE 50004289 D1 20031211; JP 2000309460 A 20001107; JP 4584401 B2 20101124; US 2002079197 A1 20020627; US 6405850 B1 20020618; US 6719123 B2 20040413

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-01-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50004289

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110329

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110331

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-11-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-10-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN A.G.

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-08-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-05-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20031105

2004-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-12-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004289 P 20031211

2003-11-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2003-11-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-11-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-11-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-10-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2003-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020909

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI