Global Patent Index - EP 1041029 A2

EP 1041029 A2 2000-10-04 - Method and device for removing air inclusions during the formation of stacks of sheets

Title (en)

Method and device for removing air inclusions during the formation of stacks of sheets

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anordnung zum Entfernen von Lufteinschlüssen beim Bilden von Stapeln aus Bogen

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour extraire des inclusions d'air pendant la formation de piles de feuilles

Publication

EP 1041029 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105265 A

Priority

DE 19914068 A

Abstract (en)

The method for removing trapped air from sheets being formed into a stack comprises sucking the air from the space (13) betw the sheets (4) in the area (12) where they are fed on to it. This may be carried out using an air extractor (23) situated betwee two adjoining stacks of paper. An Independent claim is included for a system for removing air from sheets being formed into a stack.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird ein Verfahren und eine Anordnung zum Entfernen von Lufteinschlüssen beim Bilden von Stapeln aus Bogen, die einem zu bildenden Stapel aufeinanderfolgend zugeführt und auf ihm abgelegt werden. Der Zweck des Verfahrens und der Anordnung besteht darin, daß zum Entfernen von Lufteinschlüssen das bekannte und praktizierte Pressen der Stapel nach ihrer Bildung zu vermeiden, und eine vorteilhaftere Herstellung von Stapeln zu ermöglichen, deren Lufteinschlüsse unterhalb der in der Praxis störenden Größe liegen, so daß die Stapel schon gleich nach ihrer Bildung ausreichend stabil sind. Die Lösung besteht darin, daß im Zufuhrbereich der Bogen Luft aus Zwischenräumen der Bogen abgesaugt wird. Der Vorteil der Lösung ist darin zu sehen, daß das Auftreten von Lufteinschlüssen in einem Stapel schon bei seiner Bildung vermieden wird und damit eine Nachbehandlung wie Pressen entfällt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 31/34; B65H 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/26 (2006.01); B65H 31/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/10 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42172 (2013.01); B65H 2406/30 (2013.01); B65H 2406/352 (2013.01); B65H 2601/211 (2013.01); B65H 2701/176 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19914068 A1 20000928; AT 287372 T 20050215; BR 0001428 A 20001017; CA 2302002 A1 20000927; CA 2302002 C 20070904; CN 1177744 C 20041201; CN 1269319 A 20001011; EP 1041029 A2 20001004; EP 1041029 A3 20011031; EP 1041029 B1 20050119; ES 2233234 T3 20050616; JP 2000296963 A 20001024; PT 1041029 E 20050531; US 6364312 B1 20020402

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080314

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080315

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080314

2009-05-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080315

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080315

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080314

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080314

2008-11-25 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080314

2008-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080915

2008-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ECH WILL G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-09-29 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20080915

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070322

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070523

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070327

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-26 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070323

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-23 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20070323

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070316

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-26 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070226

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070220

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051020

2005-12-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-08-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2233234 T3

2005-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-05-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-04-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050419

2005-04-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050419

2005-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050224

2005-03-14 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050314

2005-03-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050314

2005-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009252 P 20050224

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-01-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-01-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050119

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030203

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020316

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 31/34 A, 7B 65H 31/00 B, 7B 65H 31/38 B

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI