Global Patent Index - EP 1041030 A2

EP 1041030 A2 2000-10-04 - Device for moving two alignment members alternatively in antiphase

Title (en)

Device for moving two alignment members alternatively in antiphase

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur alternativen und gegenphasigen Bewegung von zwei Ausrichteinrichtungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour déplacer alternativement et en opposition de phase deux organes d'alignement

Publication

EP 1041030 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00104209 A

Priority

CH 63099 A

Abstract (en)

Each of the two articulations between the drive rocker bar (12) and sliding shafts (3a, 4a) is formed by two coaxial contact surfaces (8a, 9a; 10, 11) of semi-circular cross section. Each articulation unit is fixed only to the rocker bar. The slides hav e.g. springs (6, 7) to keep all moving surfaces in contact.

Abstract (fr)

Ce dispositif est destiné à déplacer alternativement et en opposition de phase deux organes d'alignement (1, 2) à faces verticales parallèles pour l'empilement d'éléments plats identiques à faces opposées parallèles. Ces organes d'alignement (1, 2) sont reliés à un organe d'entraînement oscillant (12) par deux coulisseaux parallèles respectifs (3, 3a; 4, 4a), associés à cet organe d'entraînement par deux articulations respectives, symétriques et à axes parallèles à son axe d'oscillation (13). Chacune des articulations est formée par deux surfaces d'appui semi-circulaires et coaxiales (8a, 10; 9a, 11), solidaires dudit organe d'entraînement (12), respectivement dudit coulisseau (3a, 4a), des moyens élastiques (6, 7) étant agencés pour maintenir ces surfaces d'appui semi-circulaires (8a, 10; 9a, 11) en contact l'une contre l'autre. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 31/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 1/98 (2006.01); B65G 57/00 (2006.01); B65H 3/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/62 (2013.01); B65H 2403/532 (2013.01); B65H 2555/10 (2013.01); Y10T 74/18216 (2013.01); Y10T 74/18336 (2013.01); Y10T 74/2101 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041030 A2 20001004; EP 1041030 A3 20020403; EP 1041030 B1 20030924; AT 250547 T 20031015; CH 693270 A5 20030515; DE 60005429 D1 20031030; DE 60005429 T2 20040715; JP 2000313523 A 20001114; JP 3423916 B2 20030707; US 6431017 B1 20020813

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170320

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170320

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170315

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-07 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2007-03-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070305

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60005429 P 20031030

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT NL

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR IT NL

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT NL

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI