Global Patent Index - EP 1041032 A1

EP 1041032 A1 2000-10-04 - Procedure of communicating with a transportation system

Title (en)

Procedure of communicating with a transportation system

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Kommunikation mit einem Transportsystem

Title (fr)

Procédé de communication avec un système de transport

Publication

EP 1041032 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00105793 A

Priority

  • EP 00105793 A
  • EP 99810279 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves at least one man-machine interface for entering destinations and for providing information. to the user. entering destinations and/or providing information to the user, descriptions are used instead of real statements of location to destinations in an easily noticeable form related to the destinations.

Abstract (de)

Bei dieser Mensch-Maschine-Schnittstelle ist ein Touchscreen (1) mit beispielsweise einer Auswahl von Fahrzielen einer Hochschule vorgesehen, die einzeln durch Berühren des Schirms wählbar sind. Die Fahrziele sind nicht als reale Ortsangaben wie beispielsweise eine Stockwerkzahl dargestellt, sondern mittels Bezeichnern. Der Benutzer wählt beispielsweise den Konferenzraum als sein Fahrziel ohne zu wissen, wo sich der Konferenzraum tatsächlich befindet. Eine Steuerung ermittelt die reale Ortsangabe mittels einer Tabelle, in der beispielsweise dem Bezeichner "Konferenzraum" die reale Ortsangabe Stockwerk 23 zugeordnet ist. Die Steuerung teilt das gewünschte Stockwerk der Aufzugskabine mit den besten Fahrbedingungen zu und informiert den Benutzer auf dem Touchscreen (1). Die Information umfasst die Bezeichnung des Transportmittels und einen Hinweis auf den Einsteigeort. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 1/46; B66B 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/46 (2006.01); B66B 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/463 (2013.01); B66B 1/468 (2013.01); B66B 2201/4615 (2013.01); B66B 2201/463 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6315083 B1 20011113; AR 023250 A1 20020904; AT 312047 T 20051215; AU 2523400 A 20001005; AU 764927 B2 20030904; BR 0001516 A 20001031; CA 2302604 A1 20001001; CA 2302604 C 20080805; CN 1133575 C 20040107; CN 1269322 A 20001011; DE 50011785 D1 20060112; DK 1041032 T3 20060403; EP 1041032 A1 20001004; EP 1041032 B1 20051207; ES 2253149 T3 20060601; HK 1031858 A1 20060324; JP 2000313572 A 20001114; NO 20001711 A 20001002; NO 20001711 D0 20000403; NO 316094 B1 20031208; TR 200000895 A2 20001121; TR 200000895 A3 20001121; ZA 200001299 B 20001020

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-27 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20080326

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-02-10 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2008-12-10 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20081202

2008-12-03 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20080508

2008-12-03 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20080508

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051207

2008-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080321

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080320

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20080321

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080325

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20080313

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080318

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20080225

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080313

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080313

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080328

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

2007-06-13 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

2006-10-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2253149 T3

2006-05-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20060400427

2006-04-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-03-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-03-24 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1031858

2006-02-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060105

2006-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011785 P 20060112

2005-12-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-12-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-12-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-11-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHUSTER, KILIAN, EL.-ING. ETH

2005-11-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FRIEDLI, PAUL, DR. SC.TECHN.

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030314

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010317

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI