Global Patent Index - EP 1041173 A1

EP 1041173 A1 2000-10-04 - Light metal cylinder block, method for making it and apparatus for carrying out the process

Title (en)

Light metal cylinder block, method for making it and apparatus for carrying out the process

Title (de)

Leichtmetallzylinderblock, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Bloc-cylindres en métal léger, méthode pour sa fabrication et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre de cette méthode

Publication

EP 1041173 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00105126 A

Priority

DE 19915038 A

Abstract (en)

A light metal cylinder block, having hard cylinder running surface layers of aluminum-silicon alloy containing finely disper round primary silicon particles, is new. A light metal cylinder block has cylinder running faces comprising a surface layer which has a hardness of NOTLESS 160 HV which consists of 10-14% Al-Si eutectic, 5-20% uniformly dispersed round primary silicon precipitate particles of 1-10 mu average diameter and balance pure Al phase. Independent claims are also included for the following: (i) production of the above light metal cylinder block by gravity, pressure or pressure die casting and then surface treatment with a laser beam parallel to a powder jet, the laser beam being pas with a width of 2 mm over the light metal matrix surface and the powder being heated to the melting temperature and inwardl diffused in 0.1-0.5 sec. at the laser beam incidence point; and (ii) equipment for carrying out the above process.

Abstract (de)

Ein Leichtmetallzylinderblock mit mindestens einer verschleißfesten und tribologisch optimierten Zylinderlauffläche besteht aus einer Leichtmetallmatrixlegierung mit einer feindispersen, Primär-Silizium-Ausscheidungen enthaltenden Oberflächenschicht. Dies wird aus rundlichen Körnern mit Korndurchmessern zwischen 1 und 10 µm gebildet. Die Oberflächenschicht enthält 10 bis 14 % AlSi-Eutektikum, 5 bis 20 % Primärsilizium, Rest reine Al-Phase. Bei der Herstellung eines Leichtmetallzylinderblocks wird ein Laserstrahl in einer Streifenbreite quer zur Vorschubrichtung von mindestens 2 mm über die Leichtmetallmatrixoberfläche geführt und hartstoffhaltiges Pulver im Auftreffpunkt des Laserstrahls auf die Leichtmetallmatrixoberfläche auf Schmelztemperatur aufgeheizt und eindiffundiert. Eine Vorrichtung zur Laufflächenbeschichtung von Hohlzylindern besteht aus Pulverzuführung, Laserstrahleinrichtung und Fokussiersystem mit Umlenkspiegel. Pulverzuführung und Laserstrahleinrichtung sind parallel zueinander in radialer und axialer Richtung des Hohlzylinders geführt. Das Fokussiersystem weist einen linienförmigen Strahlaustritt auf. Die Pulverzuführung ist mit einer Dosiereinrichtung versehen, über die der Volumenstrom des Pulvers in Abhängigkeit von der Vorschubgeschwindigkeit des Laserstrahls einstellbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 26/02; C23C 4/04; C23C 4/06; C23C 24/10; F02F 3/00; F02F 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/00 (2006.01); B23K 26/40 (2006.01); C23C 4/04 (2006.01); C23C 4/16 (2006.01); C23C 12/00 (2006.01); C23C 12/02 (2006.01); C23C 24/10 (2006.01); C23C 26/00 (2006.01); C23C 26/02 (2006.01); F02F 1/08 (2006.01); F02F 1/20 (2006.01); F02F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 7/00 (2013.01); C23C 4/04 (2013.01); C23C 4/16 (2013.01); C23C 24/10 (2013.01); C23C 26/02 (2013.01); F02F 1/20 (2013.01); F05C 2201/021 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4927 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041173 A1 20001004; EP 1041173 B1 20040526; AT 267891 T 20040615; AU 3288200 A 20001023; AU 775660 B2 20040812; BR 0006013 A 20010306; BR 0006013 B1 20110222; CA 2332944 A1 20001012; CA 2332944 C 20050524; CZ 20001135 A3 20001213; CZ 294043 B6 20040915; DE 19915038 A1 20001026; ES 2222122 T3 20050201; HU 0001361 A2 20001228; HU 0001361 A3 20010228; HU 0001361 D0 20000628; HU 222858 B1 20031229; JP 2002541322 A 20021203; JP 3467744 B2 20031117; KR 100388150 B1 20030619; PL 193699 B1 20070330; PL 339334 A1 20001009; RU 2212472 C2 20030920; US 2001003227 A1 20010614; US 2002033160 A1 20020321; US 2002153359 A1 20021024; US 6390050 B2 20020521; US 6575130 B2 20030610; US 6797916 B2 20040928; WO 0060136 A1 20001012; ZA 200006437 B 20010521

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160310

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080311

2009-05-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080311

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070319

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041026

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HYDRO ALUMINIUM DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050331

2007-03-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070329

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070316

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-11-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HYDRO ALUMINIUM DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050311

2005-03-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-03-10 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-03-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-03-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-02-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2222122 T3

2004-12-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-09-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040825

2004-08-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040826

2004-08-26 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040826

2004-08-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006550 P 20040701

2004-06-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-05-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-05-26 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-05-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HYDRO ALUMINIUM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI