Global Patent Index - EP 1041174 A1

EP 1041174 A1 2000-10-04 - Melamine containing corrosion inhibiting composition

Title (en)

Melamine containing corrosion inhibiting composition

Title (de)

Melamin enthaltendes Korrosionsschutzmittel

Title (fr)

Compositions inhibitrices de la corrosion contenant de la méamine

Publication

EP 1041174 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99106518 A

Priority

EP 99106518 A

Abstract (en)

Corrosion inhibitor composition comprises melamine and a polycarboxylic acid (I) in a molar ratio of 1:1.5-5, preferably 1:3 Corrosion inhibitor composition comprises melamine and a polycarboxylic acid of formula (I) in a molar ratio of 1:1.5-5, preferably 1:3. HOOC-X-COOH (I) X = 1-20C alkylene or alkylidene, optionally substituted by OH or COOH and optionally interrupted by cyclopentylene, cyclohexylene or phenylene. An Independent claim is also included for an aqueous system containing the corrosion inhibitor composition in an amount of 0.1-10 wt.%.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Korrosionsschutzmittel beschrieben, das aus Melamin und einer organischen Polycarbonsäure der Formel I <IMAGE> im Molverhältnis von 1:1,5 bis 5, vorzugsweise im Molverhältnis 1:3 enthält, wobei X ein geradkettiger oder verzweigter Alkylen- oder Alkylidenrest mit 1 bis 20 Kohlenstoffatomen ist, der eine oder mehrere Hydroxyl- oder Carboxylgruppen tragen und eine Cyclopentylen-, Cyclohexylen- oder Phenylengruppe enthalten kann.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23F 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23F 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23F 11/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041174 A1 20001004; EP 1041174 B1 20040630; AT 270352 T 20040715; DE 59909853 D1 20040805

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090330

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090330

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090330

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090330

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080329

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080319

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080318

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-02-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-08-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909853 P 20040805

2004-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2004-06-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010723

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI