Global Patent Index - EP 1041183 A3

EP 1041183 A3 2001-01-17 - Flat bed knitting machine

Title (en)

Flat bed knitting machine

Title (de)

Flachstrickmaschine

Title (fr)

Métier à tricoter rectiligne

Publication

EP 1041183 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00101553 A

Priority

DE 19914080 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1041183A2] The flatbed knitter, with at least one needle bed and a moving slide with at least one lock (100), has a looper (160,170) at each knock-over cam (130,140) to give looping surfaces of a different size and/or shape according to the setting of the knock-over ca (130,140). The looping surfaces are narrow or wide, according to the setting of the knock-over cams (130,140) and/or loopers (160,170) The knock-over cams (130,130) and/or loopers (160,170) have positive guide surfaces. A guide surface for the needle butt is at the looper which, after looping a stitch, gives the needle an advance movement into a defined gap from the looping surface. A guide surface for the needle butt, at the looper, can be set to give a drawing-in depth of certain needles against the drawing-in dept exerted by the knock-over cam/looping surfaces, to give a stepless needle drawing-in depth adjustment. The loopers (160,170) hav swing movement on the knock-over cams (130,140), and can be adjusted during knitting. At least one lock (100) works as a pressur lock.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 15/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/32 (2006.01); D04B 15/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/327 (2013.01); D04B 15/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19914080 A1 20000928; AT 280255 T 20041115; CN 1201039 C 20050511; CN 1269435 A 20001011; EP 1041183 A2 20001004; EP 1041183 A3 20010117; EP 1041183 B1 20041020; ES 2224923 T3 20050316; JP 2000314060 A 20001114; JP 3931290 B2 20070613; US 6240749 B1 20010605

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080107

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: H. *STOLL G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Effective date: 20050131

2007-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060128

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060128

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: H. STOLL G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2224923 T3

2005-02-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050211

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-01-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050127

2005-01-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050118

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008283 P 20041125

2004-11-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES IT LI

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030731

2001-11-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-10-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES IT LI

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH LI

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010612

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES IT LI

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI