Global patent index - EP 1041185 A3

EP 1041185 A3 2001-04-11 - Method for sizing a sheet of yarns and sizing device

Title (en)

Method for sizing a sheet of yarns and sizing device

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Schlichten einer Fadenschar und Schlichtevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour l'encollage d'une nappe de fils et dispositif d'encollage

Publication

EP 1041185 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00102005 A

Priority

DE 19914285 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1041185A2] To size a band of yarns, they are saturated with a wetting agent in an initial stage at a temp. of 65-95 degrees C and mangl to remove surplus liquid. In a second stage they are soaked with a size at a temp. of 65-95 degrees C using a contact surface (41) heated indirectly to a temp. of 100-160 degrees C. The temp. of the wetting agent in the first stage is set 5-10 degrees C higher than the size temp. in the second stage. An Independent claim is included for a sizing assembly where the cooling of the band of yarns (1) between the two process stages is limited to max. 10 degrees C. Preferred Features: The residual moisture level at the first stage is 25-60%. The size trough (23) an indirect heating with a flat contact surface (41) forming all or part of the base (24) of the size trough (23). The indirect heating is a steam pressure hot plate (38). A compact structure reduces to a min. the length of the free stretch (48) in the yar path between the final roller (14) of the wetting stage (9) and the first roller (25) of the sizing stage (10). The free path stretch (48) has a cover (49) with a heater (50). The wetting (9) and sizing (10) stages are within a common housing (53).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 1/14; D06B 3/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 1/14 (2006.01); D06B 3/18 (2006.01); D06B 23/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 3/18 (2013.01); D06B 1/145 (2013.01); D06B 23/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041185 A2 20001004; EP 1041185 A3 20010411; EP 1041185 B1 20040526; DE 19914285 A1 20001005; DE 19914285 B4 20040415; ES 2222119 T3 20050201; US 6395041 B1 20020528

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090226

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090217

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070203

2008-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070203

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070202

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070202

2006-02-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060209

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-01-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2222119

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-01-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-10-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040909

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50006551

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030407

2002-05-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUCKER-MUELLER-HACOBA GMBH & CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB IT

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI