Global patent index - EP 1041188 A3

EP 1041188 A3 2001-01-17 - Method for producing a blade spring for a winding around an ironing roller , a winding and a blade spring

Title (en)

Method for producing a blade spring for a winding around an ironing roller , a winding and a blade spring

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Lamellenfeder für eine Unterbewicklung einer Mangelwalze, eine Unterbewicklung und eine Lamellenfeder

Title (fr)

Procédé pour fabriquer un ressort à lames pour un enroulement autour d'un rouleau de repassage, un enroulement et un ressort à lames

Publication

EP 1041188 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00105162 A

Priority

  • DE 19914339 A
  • DE 19918663 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1041188A2] The method for producing a leaf spring (15) for the inner winding of a mangle roll involves its stamping out of a of spring steel blank in such a way that the stamping burr is located on the pressure-loaded side and/or the bottom side (40) of the leaf spring the spring fingers (18) facing the roll interior. Also claimed are a resultant leaf spring, and an inner winding formed of such springs for a mangle roll.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 83/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 83/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 83/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041188 A2 20001004; EP 1041188 A3 20010117

INPADOC legal status

2002-07-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-11-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7D 06F 83/00 A

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI