Global Patent Index - EP 1041206 A2

EP 1041206 A2 2000-10-04 - Lavatory unit

Title (en)

Lavatory unit

Title (de)

Toiletteneinheit

Title (fr)

Unité de toilettes

Publication

EP 1041206 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00650024 A

Priority

IE 990257 A

Abstract (en)

A lavatory unit in the form of a female urinal can be connected to any water supply. A timer valve (24) on the supply pipe (22) delivers a fixed volume of water to an overflow container (18). The water overflowing from the overflow container is delivered to the bowl (10) of the urinal by a network of pipes (20). In this way, the operation of the urinal is independent of the type of supply, and can be installed with minimal effort in a wide variety of locations. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/003 (2013.01); E03D 13/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041206 A2 20001004; EP 1041206 A3 20020918; IE S20000244 A2 20010321

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-24 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030728

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030318

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI