Global Patent Index - EP 1041210 A2

EP 1041210 A2 2000-10-04 - Exterior wall

Title (en)

Exterior wall

Title (de)

Aussenwand

Title (fr)

Mur extérieur

Publication

EP 1041210 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106881 A

Priority

DE 29905930 U

Abstract (en)

The wall comprises an outer thermal insulation layer (5), a flat inner layer (1) constructed from stacked planks (2), and a intermediate layer (10) of loam. The planks are joined together with fasteners such as nails (3), pins or dowels, leaving gaps ( in between them. A softwood or styropor insulation layer is used, and a weatherproof layer (6) of plaster or wood paneling is provided on the outside of the thermal insulation layer.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Außenwand für Bauwerke, insbesondere für Wohnbauten, bestehend aus einer tragenden Holzkonstruktion und Lehmelementen. Erfindungsgemäß besteht die Außenwand aus einer äußeren Wärmedämmschicht (5), einem inneren flächigen Brettstapelelement (1) und einer zwischen Wärmedämmschicht und Brettstapelelement eingeschlossenen flächigen Lehmschicht (10). Vorzugsweise ist das Brettstapelelement (1) mit offenen Fugen (4) gebildet ist, wobei die einzelnen Bretter (2) in Stapelrichtung nicht miteinander verleimt sondern mechanisch durch Nägel (3), Stifte, Dübel oder dergleichen verbunden sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/76 (2006.01); E04B 2/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/703 (2013.01); E04B 1/762 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19513729 A1 19960328 - HUBERT SCHMID BAUGESCHAEFT GMB [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29905930 U1 19990812; EP 1041210 A2 20001004; EP 1041210 A3 20020925

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-07-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI