Global Patent Index - EP 1041210 A3

EP 1041210 A3 2002-09-25 - Exterior wall

Title (en)

Exterior wall

Title (de)

Aussenwand

Title (fr)

Mur extérieur

Publication

EP 1041210 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00106881 A

Priority

DE 29905930 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1041210A2] The wall comprises an outer thermal insulation layer (5), a flat inner layer (1) constructed from stacked planks (2), and a intermediate layer (10) of loam. The planks are joined together with fasteners such as nails (3), pins or dowels, leaving gaps ( in between them. A softwood or styropor insulation layer is used, and a weatherproof layer (6) of plaster or wood paneling is provided on the outside of the thermal insulation layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/76 (2006.01); E04B 2/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/703 (2013.01); E04B 1/762 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29905930 U1 19990812; EP 1041210 A2 20001004; EP 1041210 A3 20020925

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-07-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI