Global Patent Index - EP 1041214 A2

EP 1041214 A2 2000-10-04 - Reinforcing system

Title (en)

Reinforcing system

Title (de)

Bewehrungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'armature

Publication

EP 1041214 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105718 A

Priority

DE 29905985 U

Abstract (en)

A steel reinforcing mesh is made in sections using crossed steel rods (1,2) joined at the crossovers. Some of the rods are b at the outer ends to form loops (3a,b) which provide grips for linking mesh sections into a self supporting structure. The loope rods can be of a thicker steel rod material and various types of linking grips can be used. The linked reinforcing provides impr strength for the poured concrete.

Abstract (de)

Es werden aus miteinander verbundenen Bewehrungsstäben (1, 2, 3) bestehende Baustahlgewebematten vorgeschlagen, die ganz ohne oder zumindest ohne nennenswerte nachträgliche Bewehrungsergänzung in der Lage sind, Biegezugkräfte und/oder Querkräfte konzentriert zu einzelnen Bauelementen oder in benachbarte Bewehrungen zu leiten. Hierzu werden zumindest einzelne, in einer Richtung angeordnete Bewehrungsstäge (3) der herkömmlichen Baustahlgewebematten durch Bewehrungselemente ersetzt, die eine konzentrierte Lasteinleitung in den Beton ermöglichen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 5/16; E04C 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/00 (2006.01); E04C 5/04 (2006.01); E04C 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/04 (2013.01); E04B 1/0038 (2013.01); E04C 5/162 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29905985 U1 19990617; EP 1041214 A2 20001004; EP 1041214 A3 20010502

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031216

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030804

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010829

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04C 5/16 A, 7E 04C 5/06 B, 7E 04C 5/04 B, 7E 04B 1/00 B

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI