Global Patent Index - EP 1041218 A3

EP 1041218 A3 2000-10-11 - Gutter bracket

Title (en)

Gutter bracket

Title (de)

Rinnenhalter für eine Dachrinne

Title (fr)

Crochet de gouttière

Publication

EP 1041218 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00106297 A

Priority

DE 19913998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1041218A2] The gutter holder (1) has a support hook (3) that fits the cross-section a roof gutter. The support hook has a one-piece clamp tongue (20) at its free end (19). A fixing shaft (4) with fixing openings (10-12) is connected to the support hook. A clamp spring (25) is fixed on the support hook facing the fixing shaft. The support hook and fixing shaft have a cross-section that fits the profile of the gutter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/072

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/072 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/0722 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041218 A2 20001004; EP 1041218 A3 20001011; DE 19913998 A1 20001005

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040312

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010329

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI