Global Patent Index - EP 1041221 A1

EP 1041221 A1 2000-10-04 - Handle for a motor vehicle which is pivotably mounted about two different axes

Title (en)

Handle for a motor vehicle which is pivotably mounted about two different axes

Title (de)

Griff für Kraftfahrzeug, der um zwei verschiedene Achsen schwenkbar gelagert ist

Title (fr)

Poignée d'ouvrant de véhicule automobile monté pivotant autour de deux axes distincts

Publication

EP 1041221 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400600 A

Priority

FR 9902922 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2790780A1] The handle for a motor vehicle door has a grip (36) outside the vehicle body panel (12) which is hinged to a support (14) to pivot outwardly between rest and open positions. The grip can be rotated inwardly around a second pivot axis (A4) from the rest position to a switching position. The grip is biased from the switching position by a spring.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une poignée d'ouvrant de véhicule automobile, du type comportant un élément de préhension (36) qui s'étend du côté externe d'un panneau de carrosserie (12) et qui est articulé sur un support de poignée (14), autour d'un premier axe (A3), de manière à pivoter vers l'extérieur entre une position de repos et une position d'ouverture, caractérisée en ce que l'élément de préhension est susceptible d'être déplacé en rotation de l'extérieur vers l'intérieur, sensiblement autour d'un second axe de rotation (A4), depuis sa position de repos jusqu'à une position de commutation dans laquelle il actionne un organe de commutation (35), et en ce qu'il est prévu des moyens de rappel élastique qui tendent à ramener l'élément de préhension (36) de sa position de commutation vers sa position de repos. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 7/00; E05B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 1/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/78 (2013.01); E05B 77/34 (2013.01); E05B 85/16 (2013.01); E05B 85/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2790780 A1 20000915; FR 2790780 B1 20010601; EP 1041221 A1 20001004

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-03-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HANDLE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE WHICH IS PIVOTABLY MOUNTED ABOUT TWO DIFFERENT AXES

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S.

2003-11-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HANDLE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE WHICH IS PIVOTABLY MOUNTED ABOUT TWO DIFFERENT AXES

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI