Global Patent Index - EP 1041231 A2

EP 1041231 A2 2000-10-04 - Device for guiding a movable hinge part on a stationary hinge part

Title (en)

Device for guiding a movable hinge part on a stationary hinge part

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Führen eines bewegbaren Scharnierteils zu einem stationären Scharnierteil

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le guidage d'un élément de charnière mobile sur un élément de charnière fixe

Publication

EP 1041231 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106779 A

Priority

  • DE 19914368 A
  • DE 29910841 U

Abstract (en)

The unit consists of a stationary hinge section (12) and a moveable hinge section (18) which are connected by an axial pin ( A releasably attached guide body( 22,22a) is attached to the stationary hinge section. The guide body has a guide track (24,26) the moveable hinge section. The guide body has an element for generating a hold on the stationary section which also provides a support surface (24) for both sections.

Abstract (de)

Türbänder bestehen aus mehreren Teilen, deren beide Scharnierteile in Gebrauchsstellung durch einen Achsstift verbunden sind. Es ist insbesondere bei schweren Türen schwierig, die Türen in die Scharniere einzuhängen, da zwei ausgerichtete Achsstifte gleichzeitig in zwei Aufnahmen eingeführt werden müssen. Die Erfindung schlägt vor, an dem stationären Scharnierteile lösbar einen Führungskörper anzubringen, der eine Führungsbahn für den bewegbaren Scharnierteil aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/1083 (2013.01); E05D 7/1044 (2013.01); E05D 2007/1094 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041231 A2 20001004; EP 1041231 A3 20001018

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI