Global Patent Index - EP 1041232 A1

EP 1041232 A1 2000-10-04 - Hinge part blank from rolled or drawn strip profiled material

Title (en)

Hinge part blank from rolled or drawn strip profiled material

Title (de)

Scharnierteil-Rohling aus einem gewalzten oder gezogenen Profilmaterialstreifen

Title (fr)

Ebauchet de partie de charnière d'une matière de bande profilée, laminée ou étirée

Publication

EP 1041232 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98107699 A

Priority

EP 98107699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955993A1] A hinge component blank made from a rolled or drawn profiled material strip which is divided up by means of a steel separating cut along a transversal boundary line (I) and split up into individual hinge component blanks once separation has occurred along a separating line (II). The shaped material strip has a T or Y shaped cross-section and is divided up into individual hinge component blanks by means of a steel separating cut along the boundary lines (I) and the separating lines (II) and in the vicinity of the hinge head (7 or 8) by means of a separating saw cut along a separating line (III).

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Scharnierteil-Rohling aus einem gewalzten oder gezogenen Profilmaterialstreifen, der durch Strahl-Trennschneiden entlang einer querlaufenden Begrenzungslinie (I) und nachfolgend dem Trennen entlang einer Trennlinie (II) in die einzelnen Scharnierteil-Rohlinge (1,2) aufgeteilt wird, weist der Profilmaterialstreifen einen T- oder Y-förmigen Querschnitt auf und wird durch Strahl-Trennschneiden entlang der Begrenzungslinien (I) und der Trennlinien (II) und im Bereich des Scharnierkopfes (7 bzw. 8) z.Z. durch einen Säge-Trennschnitt entlang einer Trennlinie (III) in die einzelnen Scharnierteil-Rohlinge (1,2) aufgeteilt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 9/00; B26F 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26F 3/00 (2006.01); E05D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26F 3/004 (2013.01); E05D 9/00 (2013.01); Y10T 16/559 (2013.01); Y10T 16/55988 (2013.01); Y10T 29/24 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49616 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49995 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12375 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19509674 A1 19960919 - FORD WERKE AG [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955993 A1 19991104; WO 9955993 A8 20000518; CN 1125228 C 20031022; CN 1305559 A 20010725; DE 59802816 D1 20020228; EP 1041232 A1 20001004; EP 1041232 B1 20020102; EP 1073818 A1 20010207; US 6539598 B1 20030401

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170328

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160414

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160407

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160414

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59802816

- Representative's name: DOERFLER, THOMAS, DR.-ING., DE

2006-04-26 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20060405

2005-04-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-05-14 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802816 20020228

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981104

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI