Global Patent Index - EP 1041233 A2

EP 1041233 A2 2000-10-04 - Automatic management terminal, particularly for the valuables-transport service

Title (en)

Automatic management terminal, particularly for the valuables-transport service

Title (de)

Endgerät mit automatischer Verwaltungsfunktion, insbesondere für den Wertgegenständeübertragungsdienst

Title (fr)

Terminal avec fonction de gestion, en particulier pour service de transport d'objets de valeur

Publication

EP 1041233 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00104560 A

Priority

IT MI990644 A

Abstract (en)

A terminal for the automatic management of, in particular, the valuables-transport service, comprising a body (2) for containing a central unit (3) which is connected to a coupling element (5) which can be connected to a valuables-transport container to be checked. The body (2) is associable with a plate (11) which can be fixed to a fixed structure and is provided with at least one element (20,21) for coupling to the body (2) which has means for interrupting the connection between the central unit (3) and the coupling element (5) when the body (2) and the plate (11) are separated. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05G 1/00 (2006.01); G07D 11/00 (2006.01); G07F 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05G 1/005 (2013.01); G07D 11/0009 (2013.01); G07D 11/0042 (2013.01); G07D 11/0063 (2013.01); G07F 9/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041233 A2 20001004; EP 1041233 A3 20011219; IT 1312236 B1 20020409; IT MI990644 A1 20000929

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030617

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021206

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020514

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05G 1/00 A, 7G 07F 9/06 B, 7E 05B 49/00 B, 7G 07C 9/00 B

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI