Global patent index - EP 1041235 A1

EP 1041235 A1 2000-10-04 - Window, door or similar with a sealing made of materials with different hardness

Title (en)

Window, door or similar with a sealing made of materials with different hardness

Title (de)

Fenster, Türe od. dergl. mit einer Dichtung aus Materialien unterschiedlicher Härte

Title (fr)

Fenêtre, porte ou similaire avec un joint d'étanchéité en matériaux de duretés différentes

Publication

EP 1041235 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00106540 A

Priority

DE 19914039 A

Abstract (en)

The window or door has at least one seal (6,7) between the frame(1) and the casement (2). The frame is sealed against the casement by means of at least one seal inserted into a groove (2a,2b) in the casement. The seal consists of a body with protrudi curved sealing lip joined to a sealing profile (8) possessing lower Shore hardness than the body. The sealing profile has a narrowing continuation and an opposite short continuation; its base part is positioned on the curved transition part between the body and the sealing lip.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Fenster, eine Türe oder dergl., beispielsweise aus armierten Kunststoffhohlkammerprofilen, mit mindestens einer Dichtung zwischen Rahmen und Flügel bei dem die Dichtung an ihrer Auflagefläche mit einem Dichtprofil (8) aus einem weicheren Werkstoff versehen ist, wobei auch die der Dichtung gegenüberliegende Fläche mittels einer Kappe aus weicherem Werkstoff als Auflage für die Dichtung abgedeckt sein kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 7/23

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/22 (2006.01); E06B 7/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/231 (2013.01); E06B 7/2314 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041235 A1 20001004; CZ 20001095 A3 20001115; CZ 298255 B6 20070808; DE 19914039 C1 20001214; PL 339159 A1 20001009; RU 2186185 C2 20020727

INPADOC legal status

2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030117

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI