Global Patent Index - EP 1041236 A2

EP 1041236 A2 2000-10-04 - Roller shutter box

Title (en)

Roller shutter box

Title (de)

Rolladenkasten

Title (fr)

Carter de volet à rouleau

Publication

EP 1041236 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105746 A

Priority

DE 19915114 A

Abstract (en)

The roller blind case is made of thermally insulated material with a L-sectioned or preferably U-sectioned hollow cavity (1) formed by an inner, (2) top (3), and preferably extra outer (4) walls. The end sides of the case are closed by plates. At least bottom edge (6) of the inner wall of the roller blind case has a cavity (7) for taking at least one pin. The bottom edge (16) of case's outer wall has a cavity (17) to take a catch-pin of an extra fitment.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft einen Rolladenkasten aus wärmedämmendem Material, mit einem nach unten offenen, im Querschnitt L- oder vorzugsweise U-förmigem Hohlraum (1), der durch eine Innenwand (2), eine Deckwand (3) und die vorzugsweise zusätzlich vorgesehene Außenwand (4) gebildet wird, wobei die Stirnseiten des Rolladenkastens durch Abschlußplatten (5) verschlossen sind. Um einen Rolladenkasten der eingangs genannten Art zu schaffen, welcher eine einfachere Montage von Zusatzbauteilen, wie zum Beispiel der Abschlußplatten und/oder der Verschlußdeckel ermöglicht, wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, daß mindestens der untere Rand (6) der Innenwand (2) des Rolladenkastens eine Aussparung (7) zur Aufnahme mindestens eines Zapfens (9a, 9b) aufweist, der an einem Zusatzbauteil wie zum Beispiel einer Abschlußplatte (5) des Rolladenkastens angebracht ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/17076 (2013.01); E06B 9/17023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041236 A2 20001004; EP 1041236 A3 20010704; DE 19915114 A1 20001005

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040310

2002-03-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010313

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI