Global Patent Index - EP 1041253 A1

EP 1041253 A1 2000-10-04 - Oil pan

Title (en)

Oil pan

Title (de)

Ölwanne

Title (fr)

Carter d'huile

Publication

EP 1041253 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00103563 A

Priority

DE 19914607 A

Abstract (en)

The oil sump has base (1), side wall (2), and an all-round raised part (3) on the inside. Elements to accommodate external forces positioned on the outside of the sump base, have webs (6), which are located on the outside of at least the sump base, in additi to conventional ribs (5). The webs project at least as far as the ribs, are wider, and have higher rigidity. Oil sump and webs a of polypropylene, and a coating between the webs is of thermoplastic elastomer.

Abstract (de)

Die Ölwand weist einen Wannenboden (1) auf, der mit einer umlaufenden Seitenwand (2) verbunden ist und auf seiner Innenseite eine umlaufende Erhebung (3) trägt. Auf der Außenseite des Wannenbodens setzt sich die Seitenwand (2) in Stegen (6) fort, die ein sicheres Abstellen der Ölwanne auf dem Boden gewährleisten. Zwischen den Stegen (6) sind Rippen (5) vorgesehen, die dünner als die Stege ausgebildet sind und dementsprechend eine geringere Steifigkeit besitzen. Sie können sich bei Steinschlag verformen und auf diese Weise die Auftreffenergie absorbieren. Die Ölwanne ist als einteiliges Spritzgußteil aus glasfaserverstärktem Polyamid ausgebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 11/0004 (2013.01); F01M 2011/0091 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041253 A1 20001004; EP 1041253 B1 20040609; DE 19914607 A1 20001012; DE 19914607 C2 20010809

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-07-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: POLYTEC PLASTICS GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50006717

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120514

2012-07-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: IBS FILTRAN KUNSTSTOFF-/ METALLERZEUGNISSE GMB, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50006717

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120514

2012-07-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: IBS FILTRAN KUNSTSTOFF-/ METALLERZEUGNISSE GMB, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50006717

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120514

2012-07-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: POLYTEC PLASTICS GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50006717

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120514

2012-07-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50006717

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER - PARTNERSCHAFT VO, DE

- Effective date: 20120514

2012-07-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50006717

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: DOMPATENT VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER - PARTNE, DE

- Effective date: 20120514

2012-06-29 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: IBS FILTRAN KUNSTSTOFF-/METALLERZEUGNISSE GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TQ

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-06-29 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: POLYTEC PLASTICS GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TQ

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-06-29 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ISE INTEX GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TQ

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-05-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50006717

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER, DE

2011-11-25 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ISE INTEX GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TQ

- Effective date: 20111026

2011-11-25 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: IBS FILTRAN KUNSTSTOFF-/METALLERZEUGNISSE GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TQ

- Effective date: 20111026

2011-11-25 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: POLYTEC RIESSELMANN GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TQ

- Effective date: 20111026

2011-09-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: POLYTEC PLASTICS GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50006717

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110728

2011-09-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: IBS FILTRAN KUNSTSTOFF-/ METALLERZEUGNISSE GMB, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50006717

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110728

2011-09-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: IBS FILTRAN KUNSTSTOFF-/ METALLERZEUGNISSE GMB, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50006717

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110728

2011-09-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: POLYTEC PLASTICS GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50006717

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110728

2011-09-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50006717

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER, DE

- Effective date: 20110728

2011-09-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50006717

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER - PARTNERSCHAFT VO, DE

- Effective date: 20110728

2011-09-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50006717

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: DOMPATENT VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER - PARTNE, DE

- Effective date: 20110728

2009-06-26 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TQ

2006-02-10 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TQ

2005-06-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-02-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-12-08 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50006717

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-06-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-06-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040609

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IBS BROCKE GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IBS FILTRAN KUNSTSTOFF-/METALLERZEUGNISSE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI