Global patent index - EP 1041266 A2

EP 1041266 A2 2000-10-04 - Control unit for controlling bypass in throttle body

Title (en)

Control unit for controlling bypass in throttle body

Title (de)

Steuervorrichtung für Drosselklappenbypassleitung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande du bypass du papillon

Publication

EP 1041266 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00106953 A

Priority

JP 9265599 A

Abstract (en)

To adjust the amount of intake air for idling operation by making use of a valve body provided in a first idle apparatus. A bypass (13) connected to an intake passage (6) while bypassing a throttle valve (8) for opening/closing the intake passage (6) is provided in a throttle body (3). A first idle apparatus (15) including a valve body (14) for opening/closing the bypass (13) and a thermosensitive actuating means (20) actuated to move the valve body (14) in the valve closing direction in accordance with the temperature rise of an engine (E) is mounted to the throttle body (3). A movable stopping means (37) for adjusting a closed position of the valve body (14) thereby adjusting an amount of intake air for idling of the engine (E) is provided in the throttle body (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/10 (2006.01); F02D 9/02 (2006.01); F02D 9/10 (2006.01); F02D 43/00 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02M 3/06 (2006.01); F02M 35/16 (2006.01); F02M 69/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 3/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP S59167940 U 19841110

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041266 A2 20001004; EP 1041266 A3 20010207; EP 1041266 B1 20041208; CN 1109188 C 20030521; CN 1268622 A 20001004; DE 60016491 D1 20050113; DE 60016491 T2 20051215; ES 2234471 T3 20050701; ID 25439 A 20001005; JP 2000283009 A 20001010; JP 4109788 B2 20080702; TW 432164 B 20010501

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2009-05-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20080401

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070519

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-04-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070417

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070329

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2234471

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-01-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60016491

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-01-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030616

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES IT

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010522

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI