Global patent index - EP 1041275 A1

EP 1041275 A1 2000-10-04 - Start device for starting an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Start device for starting an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Startvorrichtung zum Andrehen einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de démarrage pour démarrer un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1041275 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00101038 A

Priority

DE 19914904 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a starter motor (11) and a pinion (16) driven by an armature shaft (12) that can engage a toothed rim (3 of an internal combustion engine, a pre-engagement mechanism (23) for the pinion, a control and/or regulation arrangement (24) with clocked drive for the pre-engagement mechanism for pre-engaging the pinion at reduced speed and a starter motor drive. The start motor rotates the pinion into a tooth-gap position by pulsed operation if the pinion is in a tooth-to-tooth position. The contro and/or regulating arrangement switches off the starter motor after the start of engagement and then drives the motor under parti load at first then under full load after a sufficient depth of engagement is achieved.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Startvorrichtung (10) zum Andrehen von einen Zahnkranz aufweisenden Brennkraftmaschinen vorgeschlagen, mit einem Startermotor (11) und einem durch eine Ankerwelle (12) antreibbaren Ritzel (16) das in einen Zahnkranz einspurbar ist, mit einem Vorspurmechanismus (23) für das Ritzel (16) und mit einer Steuer- und/oder Regelvorrichtung (24) mit einer getakteten Ansteuerung des Vorspurmechanismus (23) zum Vorspuren des Ritzels (16) mit reduzierter Geschwindigkeit und mit einer Ansteuerung des Startermotors (11), so daß der Startermotor (11) bei vorliegender Zahn-auf- Zahn-Stellung von Ritzel und Zahnkranz (34) durch mit zeitlich mittelbarer Teillast das Ritzel (16) in eine Zahn-Lücke-Stellung verdreht wird, wobei die Steuer- und/oder Regelvorrichtung (24) nach dem Beginn des Einspurens den Startermotor (11) abschaltet und nach einem ausreichend tiefen Einspuren den Startermotor (11) zunächst mit Teillast und anschließend mit Vollast betreibt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 15/06 (2006.01); F02N 11/00 (2006.01); F02N 11/08 (2006.01); H02K 7/10 (2006.01); H02P 7/29 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/0851 (2013.01); F02N 11/087 (2013.01); F02N 2200/047 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] DE 19702932 A1 19980730 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041275 A1 20001004; EP 1041275 B1 20020612; DE 19914904 A1 20001005; JP 2000314364 A 20001114; JP 4643793 B2 20110302

INPADOC legal status

2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140120

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2015-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50000203

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140121

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-09-23 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140325

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130122

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130207

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030313

2002-10-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50000203

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-18

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010620

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT SE

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI