Global Patent Index - EP 1041279 A3

EP 1041279 A3 2001-03-07 - Valve plate for axial piston machine

Title (en)

Valve plate for axial piston machine

Title (de)

Steuerkörper für eine Axialkolbenmaschine

Title (fr)

Plaque de valves pour une machine axiale à piston

Publication

EP 1041279 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00104964 A

Priority

DE 19914266 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1041279A2] The actuator part (5) is supported on a bearing face and has two pressure channels (40,41). One of the channels is connected a relief channel (30,31) opening on a counter face (35) of the actuator part opposite to the bearing face and/or to a lubricant channel (32,33). Relief and/or lubricant channel open into an area (56) opposite to the associated pressure channel. The lubrica channel has a throttle element (58,60) and an auxiliary channel (63,64) branching off a main channel downstream of the throttle. lubricant channel simultaniously acts as relief channel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F03C 1/00; F01B 3/00; F04B 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01B 3/00 (2006.01); F04B 1/20 (2006.01); F04B 53/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/2021 (2013.01); F01B 3/0055 (2013.01); F04B 53/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041279 A2 20001004; EP 1041279 A3 20010307; EP 1041279 B1 20040428; DE 19914266 A1 20001005; DE 19914266 C2 20020228

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50006209

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140308

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140308

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141128

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140309

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140308

2014-11-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140523

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130319

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130329

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130318

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120328

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-06-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006209 P 20040603

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010329

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 03C 1/00 A, 7F 04B 1/20 B, 7F 01B 3/00 B

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI