Global Patent Index - EP 1041284 A3

EP 1041284 A3 2001-03-14 - Suction valve for compressor

Title (en)

Suction valve for compressor

Title (de)

Einlassventil für Kompressor

Title (fr)

Soupape d'admission pour compresseur

Publication

EP 1041284 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00302135 A

Priority

JP 8670599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1041284A2] In a reciprocating compressor, a suction valve is abutted against a stopper to hold open a suction port even when the compressor is in a stop state. The suction valve is movable relative to the suction port to open or close the suction port. The stopper is for restricting movement of the suction valve. It is preferable that the suction port is formed in a valve plate placed between a cylinder block and a cylinder head.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 39/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/1073 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041284 A2 20001004; EP 1041284 A3 20010314; JP 2000283042 A 20001010

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-07-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010915

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI