Global Patent Index - EP 1041286 A2

EP 1041286 A2 2000-10-04 - Scroll compressor with reverse rotation prevention

Title (en)

Scroll compressor with reverse rotation prevention

Title (de)

Spiralverdichter mit Schutz gegen Drehrichtungsumkehr

Title (fr)

Compresseur à spirales avec des protections contre la rotation en marche arrière

Publication

EP 1041286 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00200684 A

Priority

US 28049599 A

Abstract (en)

A scroll type compressor is employed in a heat pump system having a solenoid actuated four way flow reversing valve. A processor monitors a system parameter that is indicative that a flow reversal has taken place or is about to take place, at which time the compressor motor is shut down for a predetermined period of time during which the compressor produces objectionable noise produced by separation of the scroll element due to a low pressure differential over the compressor. At the end of the period, the compressor motor is reenergized. The processor is arranged to cycle the compressor at the beginning and end of each defrost cycle or when the system undergoes a change in its operational mode. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 18/02; F04C 29/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 28/06 (2006.01); F04B 49/06 (2006.01); F04C 2/02 (2006.01); F04C 18/02 (2006.01); F04C 28/28 (2006.01); F04C 29/06 (2006.01); F24F 13/24 (2006.01); F25B 1/00 (2006.01); F25B 1/04 (2006.01); F25B 30/02 (2006.01); F25B 49/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 28/28 (2013.01); F04C 28/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB GR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041286 A2 20001004; EP 1041286 A3 20011024; AU 2266100 A 20001005; CN 1268651 A 20001004; JP 2000297771 A 20001024

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-17 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020521

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES FR GB GR IT NL

2002-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020424

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB GR IT NL

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI