Global Patent Index - EP 1041333 A2

EP 1041333 A2 2000-10-04 - Dry disconnect coupling with improved poppet seal

Title (en)

Dry disconnect coupling with improved poppet seal

Title (de)

Trocken-Trennkupplung mit verbesserter Dichtung

Title (fr)

Accouplement étanche lors de la déconnexion avec joint d'étanchéité amélioré

Publication

EP 1041333 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00302742 A

Priority

US 28546799 A

Abstract (en)

A dry disconnect coupling (10) for connecting one fluid conduit to another fluid conduit to form a continuous flow path, said coupling comprising a receptacle (20) and a coupler (30), each being secured to a respective conduit or container, with means for securing and locking the receptacle and the coupler together to provide a connection for transfer of fluids, a poppet valve (212) seated in each of the receptacle and the coupler for sealing a respective flow passageway therein when the coupling is uncoupled, and which valves can be unseated to permit flow of fluid through the coupling when the coupling is coupled and locked; the poppet valve of the receptacle having resilient annular sealing means (220) in its poppet sealing surface; the coupler body and poppet and the receptacle body and poppet being provided with resilient annular sealing means at their interfaces, the coupler poppet being self-aligning, the arrangement of the sealing means and the geometry of the coupler body and poppet and the receptacle body and poppet being such that a small interface between the two poppets is provided whereby only a minimal volume of fluid remains in the coupling after uncoupling. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16L 37/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16L 37/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16L 37/30 (2013.01); Y10T 137/87925 (2015.04); Y10T 137/87973 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041333 A2 20001004; EP 1041333 A3 20020814; CA 2302789 A1 20001002; US 6155294 A 20001205

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030215

2003-06-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI