Global Patent Index - EP 1041339 A1

EP 1041339 A1 2000-10-04 - Composite open cap for large industrial and medical gas bottles

Title (en)

Composite open cap for large industrial and medical gas bottles

Title (de)

Offene Verbundkappe für grosse industrielle und medizinische Gasflaschen

Title (fr)

Chapeau ouvert composite de grandes bouteilles de gaz industriels et médicaux

Publication

EP 1041339 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400537 A

Priority

FR 9904090 A

Abstract (en)

The polymer body (1) includes a tapped metal or metal alloy insert (10). An Independent claim is included for the method of making the cap. The insert (2), preferably tapped with a screw thread, i placed around a molding core. The assembly is surrounded by a mold. Polymer constituents are introduced. Following polymerizatio disassembly takes place. The corresponding gas bottle with a cap is also claimed.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention a trait à un capotage de protection type ouvert pour récipient de fluide, en particulier pour bouteille de gaz, composé d'un corps de capotage (1) en matériau polymère comprenant un insert (2) en métal ou en alliage métallique taraudé (10). De préférence, l'insert (2) a sensiblement une forme de bague à paroi interne taraudée et le corps (1) de capotage est surmoulé autour de l'insert (2) taraudé. De plus, l'insert (2) peut comporter un ou plusieurs évidements (7) et/ou un ou plusieurs renforts (6) sur sa paroi périphérique externe. En outre, l'invention concerne aussi une bouteille de gaz munie d'un tel capotage de protection, ainsi que le procédé de fabrication d'un tel capotage de protection. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17C 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17C 13/04 (2006.01); F16C 13/06 (2006.01); F17C 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17C 13/06 (2013.01); F17C 2201/054 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0308 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0338 (2013.01); F17C 2270/02 (2013.01); Y10T 137/7043 (2015.04); Y10T 137/7062 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041339 A1 20001004; EP 1041339 B1 20020502; EP 1041339 B2 20041229; AR 023257 A1 20020904; AT 217065 T 20020515; AU 2265700 A 20001005; AU 752535 B2 20020919; BR 0001513 A 20001010; CA 2300501 A1 20001001; CA 2300501 C 20080129; CN 1117944 C 20030813; CN 1269483 A 20001011; DE 60000143 D1 20020606; DE 60000143 T2 20021031; DE 60000143 T3 20050811; DK 1041339 T3 20020708; DK 1041339 T4 20050411; ES 2176155 T3 20021201; ES 2176155 T5 20050701; FR 2791757 A1 20001006; FR 2791757 B1 20010615; JP 2000304197 A 20001102; JP 4611485 B2 20110112; PT 1041339 E 20020930; US 6311722 B1 20011106; ZA 200001307 B 20001020

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170228

2016-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160216

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160210

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-07-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2005-06-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2005-04-20 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050400931

2005-04-11 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

2005-03-29 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2005-03-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20041229

2005-01-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE

2004-12-29 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-02-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-01-08 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1041339E

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2176155 T3

2002-10-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-10-09 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020402536

2002-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-07-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-06-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-06-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000143 20020606

2002-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-05-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-05-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-05-02 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 217065 T 20020515

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011012

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI